IL HB2213 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-04 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-04 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the purpose of the Act is to ensure that children and youth who are parents, expectant parents, or the victims of domestic or sexual violence are identified by schools in a manner respectful of their privacy and safety; treated with dignity and regard; and provided the protection, instruction, and related support services necessary to enable them to meet State educational standards and successfully attain a high school diploma. Amends the School Code and the Illinois School Student Records Act to make changes concerning definitions, the transfer of students, the suspension or expulsion of pupils, home instruction, the review and revision of policies, confidentiality, ombudspersons, accommodations and services, alternative public schools, compulsory school attendance, charter schools, and the right to inspect and copy school student permanent and temporary records. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-DOMESTIC/SEX VIOLENCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 76 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading December 3, 2014 |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 4, 2014 |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2014 |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; 3-9(b) |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 009-004-000 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2013-03-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 076-033-000 |
2013-03-21 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2013-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2013-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2013-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2013-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 009-000-001 |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2013-03-07 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 10 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 1-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 10-21.3a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 10-22.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 10-22.6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 10-30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 10-35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 10-40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 10-45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 13A-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 26-2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |