IL HB2205 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0133
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0133
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following change. Provides that the chief executive officer must post the full financial report on a school closure on the school district's website 8 months after he or she publishes notice of the proposed school closure (rather than at the time he or she publishes notice of the proposed school closure). Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-CHI-SCHOOL CLOSING
Sponsors
Rep. Nicholas Smith [D] | Rep. Sonya Harper [D] | Rep. Delia Ramirez [D] | Rep. Sue Scherer [D] |
Rep. Lamont Robinson [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0133 |
2019-07-26 | House | Effective Date July 26, 2019 |
2019-07-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 011-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 008-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-03-12 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-03-12 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 34-230 | Amended Code | Citation Text |