IL HB2186 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act. Changes the definition of "relocation" to mean: a change of residence from the child's current primary residence to a new residence within this State (rather than located in a specific county within in this State) that is more than 50 miles (rather than 25 miles) from the child's current residence; or a change of residence from the child's current primary residence to a residence outside the borders of this State that is more than 50 miles (rather than 25 miles) from the current primary residence. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IMDMA-RELOCATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseTabled
2019-04-03HouseMotion Prevailed
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-19HouseMotion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-02-20HouseTo Family Law Subcommittee
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7505600Amended CodeCitation Text
7505609.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback