IL HB2154 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 30, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 30, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Provides that a county may not require a permit or other approval for the installation, maintenance, placement, replacement, or servicing of a battery-charged fence if the battery-charged fence is located on nonresidential property completely surrounded by a nonelectric perimeter fence or wall that is not less than 5 feet in height and does not exceed 10 feet in height or 2 feet higher than the nonelectric perimeter fence or wall, whichever is higher (rather than surrounded by a nonelectric-perimeter fence or wall). Provides that the signs on the fence shall be located not less than 30 feet apart (rather than located on the fence at not more than 50-foot intervals).
Title
LOCAL-BATTERY-CHARGED FENCES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 30, 2024 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2023 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 010-000-000 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Linda Holmes |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2023-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2023-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2023-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-12022 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 110-80 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 11-13-28 | New Code | See Bill Text |