IL HB2152 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0251
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Provides that 2 years after the effective date of the Act, and once every 5 years thereafter, the Technical Assistance Center must propose to the General Assembly an updated ratio of clinical, non-student staff members to students based on actual ratios in this State and any new information related to appropriate benchmarks for clinician-to-student ratios. Provides that the updated benchmark must represent a ratio of no less than one clinical, non-student staff member to 1,250 students. Removes a provision providing that 5 years after the effective date of the Act, each public college or university must maintain a ratio of one clinical, non-student staff member to 1,000 students. Provides that the monitoring measures of local partnership programs must include the ratio of clinical, non-student staff to student population and the number of linkage agreements and contracts in place based on student population (rather than only the number of linkage agreements and contracts in place based on student population). Provides that the Commission on Government Forecasting and Accountability, in conjunction with the Illinois Community College Board and the Board of Higher Education, must make recommendations to the General Assembly on the amounts necessary to implement the Act. Provides that the initial recommendation must be provided by the Commission no later than December 31, 2019 and any appropriation provided in advance of this recommendation may be used for planning purposes. Provides that no provision of the Act may be funded by student fees created on or after July 1, 2020 (rather than new student fees). Makes other changes. Effective July 1, 2020, except that certain provisions are effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MENTAL HEALTH ACTION ON CAMPUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0251
2019-08-09HouseEffective Date August 9, 2019
2019-08-09HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-21HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-23HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2019-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019
2019-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-06SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 009-000-000
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-04-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-04-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2019-04-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-04-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-04-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-04-11SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-10SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-10SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-10SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-04-09HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-001
2019-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-04-02HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 017-000-000
2019-03-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
2019-03-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-03-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-02-28HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-02-28HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 019-000-000
2019-02-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-02-20HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-02-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Mental Health Committee
2019-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-02-13HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-02-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback