IL HB2135 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0130
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0130
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a prosecution for criminal sexual assault, aggravated criminal sexual assault, or aggravated criminal sexual abuse may be commenced at any time (rather than within 10 years of the commission of the offense if the victim reported the offense to law enforcement authorities within 3 years after the commission of the offense). Makes conforming changes.
Title
CRIM PROSECUTIONS-SEX OFFENSES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0130 |
2019-07-26 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Criminal Committee; |
2019-03-26 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 006-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-03-26 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-03-06 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-03-06 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-05 | House | To Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 3-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |