IL HB2134 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0460
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Freedom From Location Surveillance Act. Provides that "electronic device" means any device that enables access to, or use of an electronic communication service that provides the ability to send or receive wire or electronic communications, including wireless communications connecting the device to a telephone network. Modifies the definition of "location information" to include information concerning the location of an electronic device that, in whole or in part, is generated by or derived from the possession of the device (rather than only operation of the device). Provides that a law enforcement agency shall not obtain location information (rather than current or future location information) pertaining to a person or his or her effects without first obtaining a court order under the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963 based on probable cause. Provides that the Act does not apply to a law enforcement agency obtaining basic subscriber information from a service provider under a valid court order or search warrant (removes subpoena). Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCATION SURVEILLANCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0460
2019-08-23HouseEffective Date August 23, 2019
2019-08-23HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2019-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
2019-05-08SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2019-05-02SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-04-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-09SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2019
2019-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2019-04-03HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
2019-04-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-04-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2019-04-02HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2019-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2019-03-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
2019-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-03-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-03-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-02-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
72516810Amended CodeCitation Text
72516815Amended CodeCitation Text
72516820Amended CodeCitation Text
72516825Amended CodeCitation Text
72516830Amended CodeCitation Text
7251685Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback