IL HB2126 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0248
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Post-Traumatic Stress Disorder Awareness Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code to allow for the issuance of decals for Universal special license plates by K9s for Veterans, NFP. Provides for the original fee, renewal fees, and fee distribution for Universal special license plates with decals issued by the K9s for Veterans, NFP.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-PTSD LICENSE DECALS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0248
2019-08-09HouseEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-08-09HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2019-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
2019-05-14SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Transportation; 013-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Transportation
2019-04-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-09SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-001-000
2019-03-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2019-03-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-13HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 012-000-000
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.891New CodeSee Bill Text
62553-699.14Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback