IL HB2119 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that a duty of the regional superintendent of schools is to inspect and approve school building plans and specifications for energy conservation measures. In the Article concerning school energy conservation and saving measures, makes changes concerning definitions, the evaluation and submission of guaranteed energy savings contract proposals, performance reviews, the award of a contract, the written guarantee, installment payment contracts and lease purchase agreements, cost savings, available funds, an energy savings template, qualified providers, and the Smart Energy Design Assistance Center.
Title
SCH CD-ENERGY CONSERVATION
Sponsors
Rep. Joyce Mason [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 19b-1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-1.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-1.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-1.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-1.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-2.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 19b-90 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 3-14.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2119&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB2119.htm |