IL HB2107 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, in a county with 3,000,000 or more inhabitants, a person filing a tax objection complaint shall serve a copy of the tax objection complaint by electronic mail upon the applicable municipality and the school district. Provides that an objection to an assessment shall not be allowed by the court in a county with 3,000,000 or more inhabitants if the person paying the taxes is unable to provide written evidence to the State's Attorney that a copy of the tax objection complaint was served on the municipality and the school district. Provides that, if an objection is made claiming incorrect valuation, the complaint shall specify the current assessment and the assessment alleged by the plaintiff to be correct. Provides that, when a taxing district has intervened in a tax objection proceeding and filed its appearance, compromise agreements shall not be accepted by the court over the objection of the intervening taxing district.
Title
PROP TX-OBJECTIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-23 | House | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee |
2023-02-21 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 23-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 23-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 23-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2107&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB2107.htm |