IL HB2105 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-11 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-11 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Requires the county board chairman in every county with a population of less than 3,000,000 to appoint, no later than December 31, 2011, a volunteer 7 member mental health advisory committee composed of members of the general public, if the county has established a county health department, but no mental health program has been approved as provided under the Act. Amends the Community Mental Health Act. Requires the county board chairman in every county with a population of less than 3,000,000, or the township supervisor of a township located in a county with a population of 3,000,000 or more, to appoint, no later than December 31, 2011, a volunteer 7 member mental health advisory committee composed of members of the general public, if no community mental health board has been established in the county or township as provided under the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
MHDD-ADVISORY COMMITTEE
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Tryon [R] | Rep. Al Riley [D] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Sandra Pihos [R] |
Sen. Maggie Crotty [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-01-08 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-02 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 30 N: 21 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-02 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 30 N: 21 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-11 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-01-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2013-01-08 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2013-01-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2013-01-08 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-01-08 | House | House Concurs |
2013-01-08 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 112-000-000 |
2013-01-06 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2013-01-06 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-06 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2013-01-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2013-01-06 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2013-01-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2013-01-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 3, 2013 |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 2, 2013 |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 014-000-000 |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 8, 2013 |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Motion Prevailed 030-021-000 |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Senator Righter and Senator Dillard request a Roll Call on the motion to Waive the Posting Notice. |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Senator Crotty - Moves to waive all posting requirements, so this bill may be heard in the Executive Committee today. |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. M. Maggie Crotty |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. M. Maggie Crotty |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2011-03-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-31 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 005-000-000 |
2011-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Counties & Townships Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2011-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Winters |
2011-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2011-03-07 | House | Re-assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2011-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Winters |
2011-02-24 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Winters |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
405 | 20 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-25027 | New Code | See Bill Text |