IL HB2089 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Transportation, on behalf of the State of Illinois, to convey, by quitclaim deed, all right, title, and interest of the State of Illinois and the Department of Transportation in and to certain real estate to the Village of Bensenville. Effective immediately.
Title
IDOT LAND TRANSFER-BENSENVILLE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-004-001 |
2020-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-04 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000 |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |