IL HB2084 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on August 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0438
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on August 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0438
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Creates the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Services Strategic Planning Task Force for the purpose of developing a five-year comprehensive strategic plan for the State's mental health services. Provides that the plan shall address certain issues impacting mental health and developmental disabilities services including reducing regulatory redundancy, improving access to care, and maintaining financial viability for providers that is cost neutral or saves the State money. Contains provisions concerning the composition of the Task Force; appointments; compensation; and reporting requirements. Effective immediately.
Title
MHDD SERVICE PLAN TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0438 |
2011-08-18 | House | Effective Date August 18, 2011 |
2011-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 106-000-000 |
2011-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2011-05-18 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-18 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Fred Crespo |
2011-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2011-05-18 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-001-000 |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. M. Maggie Crotty |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2011 |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Noland |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 006-000-000 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Noland |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2011 |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2011 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 8, 2011 |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2011-04-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2011-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-04-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2011-03-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
2011-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2011-03-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2011-03-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-16 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Disability Services Committee; 005-000-000 |
2011-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Disability Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Disability Services Committee |
2011-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
2011-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2011-02-24 | House | Assigned to Disability Services Committee |
2011-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |