IL HB2048 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that notwithstanding whether the laws of the state or territory where the non-resident resides related to firearm ownership, possession, and carrying are substantially similar to the requirements to obtain a license under the Act, the Department of State Police shall, no later than 120 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act, allow for a non-resident license application if the applicant is an active duty member of the Armed Forces of the United States who is stationed in the State and lives in the State. Provides that a non-resident active duty member of the Armed Forces of the United States who is stationed in the State and lives in the State shall apply to the Department and must meet all of the qualifications under the Act and shall submit: (1) the application and documentation required and the applicable fee; (2) a photocopy of a valid military identification card or Official Proof of Service Letter; and (3) a photocopy of permanent change-of-station orders to an assignment in the State. Provides for emergency rulemaking to implement the amendatory Act. Establishes fees. Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that persons licensed to possess a concealed firearm under the Firearm Concealed Carry Act and current or retired police officers authorized by law to possess a concealed firearm shall be exempt from the Code that prohibits possession of those firearms. Makes conforming changes to the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Effective immediately.
Title
FIREARMS-NON RESIDENT MILITARY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 66 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 66 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 5-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 3.4b | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2048&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2048.htm |