IL HB2045 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961 relating to the provision concerning a minor under 14 years of age's access to firearms. Provides that this provision concerning the regulation of the storage of firearms is an exclusive power and function of the State. Provides that a unit of local government, including a home rule unit, may not regulate the storage of firearms.
Title
CRIM CD-MINOR-FIREARM-PREEMPTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 61 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pam Roth |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Barickman |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2011-04-06 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 061-048-002 |
2011-04-06 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2011-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 011-001-000 |
2011-02-23 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2011-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 24-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |