IL HB2040 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0667
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0667
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the administration of the Code.
Title
TRANSPORTATION-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0667 |
2018-08-03 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-03 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 107-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 040-001-000 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Transportation |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Transportation |
2018-05-22 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (ED) |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Special Issues (ED) |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-23 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate *** |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate *** |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 2-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |