IL HB2039 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-11-17 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that a person serving a sentence for any criminal offense under the Criminal Code of 1961 or the Criminal Code of 2012 or a similar local ordinance for which the statutory penalty has been subsequently reduced or altered may petition the trial court that entered the judgment of conviction to request resentencing or dismissal in accordance with the statutory penalty in effect at the time of the filing of the petition. Provides that upon verified petition for resentencing by the defendant, the trial court that entered the judgment of conviction in a defendant's case may order resentencing at any time after 30 days have passed following the imposition of a sentence under a guilty verdict or a finding of guilt for any criminal offense under the Criminal Code of 1961 or the Criminal Code of 2012 or a similar local ordinance provided: (1) the State's Attorney or other prosecuting attorney is given at least 30-day notice of the filing of the petition seeking resentencing; (2) the statutory penalty for the offense for which the defendant was found guilty or convicted, since his or her plea of guilty or conviction, has been subsequently reduced or altered in a manner that includes, but is not limited to: (A) reducing the minimum or maximum sentence for the offense; (B) granting the court more discretion over the range of penalties available for the offense; or (C) changing the penalties associated with the offense or conduct underlying the offense in any way.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM PRO-PENALTY REDUCTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-04-12HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-10HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-28HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2019-03-26HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000
2019-03-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7255116-2.2New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback