IL HB2037 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-02 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Makes changes to a credit awarded for wages paid to qualified veterans. Provides that the credit shall be: (1) $5,000 (instead of 20% of the gross wages, but not to exceed $5,000) for certain veterans who were unemployed at the time of hire; and (2) $1,200 (instead of 10% of the gross wages, but not to exceed $1,200) for other qualified veterans. Changes the definition of "qualified veteran" to include all Illinois residents who are members of the National Guard, reserve, or regular component of the Armed Forces of the United States. Allows the credit to be prorated. Provides that the credit is exempt from the Act's automatic sunset provision. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INCOME TAX-VETERANS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-28HouseTo Income Tax Subcommittee
2019-02-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355217Amended CodeCitation Text
355217.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback