IL HB2028 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Pharmacy Practice Act. Defines "pharmacist clinician", "prescriptive authority", and "appropriately trained". Provides that a pharmacist clinician shall have on file at his or her place of practice written guidelines and protocols authorizing prescriptive authority. Provides that the guidelines and protocols authorizing prescriptive authority shall include a statement (i) identifying the practitioner authorized to prescribe and the pharmacist clinician who is a party to the guidelines or protocol, (ii) of the types of decisions a pharmacist clinician is authorize to make, (iii) of the activities the pharmacist clinician is to follow in the course of exercising prescriptive authority, and (iv) that describes appropriate mechanisms for reporting to the practitioner monitoring activities and results. Provides that claims of professional superiority in filling prescriptions or in any manner implying professional superiority that may reduce the public confidence in the ability, character, or integrity of other pharmacies or pharmacists are unlawful. Provides restrictions in advertising. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PHARMACY ACT-DIABETIC SHOES
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Reitz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2011-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dan Reitz |
2011-02-23 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2011-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Reitz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 85 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 85 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 85 | 5.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 85 | 9.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |