IL HB1891 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Removes the prohibition on the use of a silencer or other device to muffle or mute the sound of the explosion or report resulting from the firing of any gun. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits the offense of unlawful use of weapons when the person knowingly uses, attaches, or possesses with the intent to use or attach any device or attachment of any kind for silencing the report of any handgun, unless the use, attachment, or possession with the intent to use the device or attachment is on the premises of a firing or shooting range; or possesses any device or attachment of any kind designed, used, or intended for use in silencing the report of any other firearm if the device or attachment is not possessed in compliance with the National Firearms Act (rather than a person commits the offense of unlawful use of weapons when the person possesses any device or attachment of any kind designed, used, or intended for use in silencing the report of any firearm). Provides that a person commits the offense of unlawful sale or delivery of firearms when he or she knowingly transfers or gives a suppressor or silencer to a person not authorized to possess the suppressor or silencer under federal law. Provides that a violation of this provision is a Class 3 felony. Effective immediately.
Title
WILDLIFE&CRIM CD-SILENCERS
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Elik [R] | Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] |
Rep. David Welter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2022-01-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Amy Elik |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 2.33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1891&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB1891.htm |