IL HB1887 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fire Sprinkler Contractor Licensing Act. Creates the State Fire Sprinkler Contractor Advisory Board. Provides that the Board shall (i) advise the State Fire Marshal on matters of licensing, continuing education, statutory changes, and administrative rulemaking, (ii) make recommendations to the State Fire Marshal on those matters, and (iii) hear and make recommendations to the State Fire Marshal on disciplinary matters that require a formal evidentiary hearing. Extends the licensing period from one year to 2 years. Provides that each licensee must complete 16 hours of continuing education in the 2-year period preceding their renewal date, beginning with licenses renewed after January 1, 2012. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
FIRE SPRINKLER ACT-BOARD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2011-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2011-02-22 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 317 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 317 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 317 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 317 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 317 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |