IL HB1864 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on February 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-01 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1160
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on February 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-01 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1160
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Community College Act. Provides that as of July 1, 2012, a community college district must maintain a minimum required combined in-district tuition and universal fee rate per semester credit hour equal to 70% (instead of 85%) of the State-average combined rate, as determined by the Illinois Community College Board, or the total revenue received by the community college district from combined in-district tuition and universal fees must be at least 30% of the total revenue received by the community college district, as determined by the Board, for equalization funding. Effective July 1, 2011.
Title
COMM COLLEGE-GRANT FUNDING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-05 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 94 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-01 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1160 |
2013-02-01 | House | Effective Date February 1, 2013 |
2013-02-01 | House | Governor Approved |
2012-12-06 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2012-12-05 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2012-12-05 | House | House Concurs |
2012-12-05 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 094-014-001 |
2012-12-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2012-12-04 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 008-000-000 |
2012-12-03 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Higher Education Committee |
2012-12-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2012-12-03 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2012-07-27 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2012-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2012-05-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-05-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2012 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2012 |
2012-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Higher Education; 007-000-000 |
2012-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2012-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Edward D. Maloney |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Edward D. Maloney |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack McGuire |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2011-03-10 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Esther Golar |
2011-03-10 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Marlow H. Colvin |
2011-03-10 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2011-03-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-012-001 |
2011-03-10 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dan Brady |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2011-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough |
2011-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-03-02 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2011-02-22 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 805 | 2-16.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |