IL HB1855 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that the Department of State Police may revoke and seize a Firearm Owner's Identification Card previously issued under the Act of a person who fails to report the loss or theft of a handgun a second time to the local law enforcement agency within 72 hours after obtaining knowledge of the second loss or theft. Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Provides that if a person who possesses a valid Firearm Owner's Identification Card and who possesses or acquires a handgun thereafter loses or misplaces the handgun, or if the handgun is stolen from the person, the person must report the loss or theft to the local law enforcement agency within 72 hours after obtaining knowledge of the loss or theft. Effective immediately.
Title
FIREARM OWNERS-LOSS-THEFT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-10-30 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Winters |
2012-03-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-01-25 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2012-01-25 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2012-01-24 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2011-04-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2011-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2011-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2011-04-13 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2011-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 006-004-000 |
2011-02-22 | House | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 65 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-4.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |