IL HB1854 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0420
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0420
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Code. Provides that the Department of Human Services when a recipient of services under this Code, whether admitted on a voluntary or involuntary basis, is being discharged from an inpatient facility, shall provide the recipient and the recipient's conservator, guardian, or other legally authorized representative a written aftercare plan prior to the recipient's discharge from the facility. Provides that the written aftercare plan shall include, to the extent known, all of the following components: (1) the nature of the illness and followup required; (2) medications including side effects and dosage schedules; (3) if the recipient was given an informed consent form with his or her medications, the form shall satisfy the requirement for information on side effects of the medications; 4) expected course of recovery; (5) recommendations regarding treatment that is relevant to the recipient's care; (6) referrals to providers of medical and mental health services; and (7) other relevant information. Provides that the recipient shall be advised by facility personnel that he or she may designate another person to receive a copy of the aftercare plan.
Title
MHDD CD-AFTERCARE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0420 |
2021-08-20 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Health; 011-000-000 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-03-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |