IL HB1850 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Rural/Downstate Health Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
HEALTH-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-01 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr. | |
2010-12-01 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro | |
2010-12-01 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. | |
2010-12-01 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William B. Black | |
2010-12-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended | |
2010-12-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. André M. Thapedi | |
2010-12-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-12-01 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-12-01 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-12-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended | |
2010-12-01 | Balanced Budget Note Filed | |
2010-11-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended | |
2010-11-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended | |
2010-11-29 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended | |
2010-11-29 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-11-29 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2010-11-29 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz | |
2010-11-29 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. | |
2010-11-29 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca | |
2010-11-29 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. André M. Thapedi | |
2010-11-29 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. André M. Thapedi | |
2010-11-29 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. André M. Thapedi | |
2010-11-29 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. André M. Thapedi | |
2010-11-29 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. André M. Thapedi | |
2010-11-29 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 009-001-000 | |
2010-11-23 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee | |
2010-11-17 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-11-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-11-16 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-11-16 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André M. Thapedi | |
2010-11-15 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-11-15 | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2010-11-15 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 11, 2011 | |
2010-11-15 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. André M. Thapedi | |
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** | |
2009-03-04 | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000 | |
2009-03-03 | Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed | |
2009-03-03 | Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-02-19 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-17 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios | |
2009-02-17 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |