IL HB1817 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - To Election Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides that the State Board of Elections shall produce an online petition packet generation system that allows a potential candidate to enter the appropriate information and select the office for which he or she wishes to run and the system will generate all of the appropriate forms with the accurate formatting and information. Provides that no petitions created by the State Board's online petition packet generation system may be challenged on the basis of formatting or other technicalities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-PETITION GENERATOR

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-06HouseTo Election Administration Subcommittee
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1057-10.4New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback