IL HB1815 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 44-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the General Assembly Operations Act. Provides that on and after the effective date of this amendatory Act, the General Assembly shall, by joint resolution, establish a revenue estimate for the following State fiscal year by April 30th of each year. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GA-REVENUE ESTIMATE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
25108New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback