IL HB1809 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Corporate Fiduciary Act. In provisions concerning office locations of corporate fiduciaries, removes the requirement that a corporate fiduciary of a bank, savings and loan association, or savings bank give notice of intent to establish a branch office to the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation 30 days prior to purchasing or leasing of land, building, or equipment. Replaces references to "Commissioner" with "Secretary". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CORP FIDUCIARY-BANKS-OFFICE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-13HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-15HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-15SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2017
2017-05-10SenateDo Pass Financial Institutions; 008-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Financial Institutions
2017-03-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-17SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-17SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2017-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-17SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 085-023-000
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-02-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-22HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 004-000-000
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2056201-7Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback