IL HB1803 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0205
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0205
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Collection Agency Act by changing references to the General Professions Dedicated Fund to refer to the Financial Institution Fund. Provides that any fees collected and deposited into the General Professions Dedicated Fund for Fiscal Year 2021 may be transferred by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation to the Financial Institution Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
COLLECTION AGENCY ACT-FUND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0205 |
2021-07-30 | House | Effective Date July 30, 2021 |
2021-07-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2021 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Do Pass Financial Institutions; 007-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2021-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 010-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Financial Institutions Committee |
2021-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark L. Walker |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 425 | 4.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 425 | 8a | Amended Code | Citation Text |