IL HB1798 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Makes appropriations for personnel-related expenditures for various state agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$VARIOUS PERSONAL SERVICES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-28HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-02-14HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-02-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2017-02-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-02-08HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2017-02-08HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass as Amended / Standard Debate State Government Administration Committee; 004-003-000
2017-02-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-02-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2017-02-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-02-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-02-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-02-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-02-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-02-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback