IL HB1795 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0279
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0279
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Trust Code. Moves the definitions of "appointive property" and "permissible appointee" from the Trust Decanting Article and the Uniform Powers of Appointment Law to the definitions Section for the entire Code. Makes changes in provisions concerning: definitions; default and mandatory rules; governing law; nonjudicial settlement agreements; representation; representation by holders of certain powers; trust creation; trusts created in other jurisdictions; trusts for domestic animals; modifications to achieve settlor's objectives; creditor claims; revocation by divorce or annulment; directed trusts; the trustee's duty to inform and account; distribution upon termination; life insurance; conversion by agreement; trust decanting; powers of appointment; and applicability. In the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Code, changes a cross-reference to the Illinois Trust Code.
Title
TRUST CODE-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0279 |
2021-08-06 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-06 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-039-000 |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-16 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-006-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
405 | 5 | 3-605 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
760 | 3 | 103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
760 | 3 | 105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
760 | 3 | 107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
760 | 3 | 1103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
760 | 3 | 111 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
760 | 3 | 1202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
760 | 3 | 1211 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
760 | 3 | 1215 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
760 | 3 | 1302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
760 | 3 | 1324 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
760 | 3 | 1506 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
760 | 3 | 301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
760 | 3 | 302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
760 | 3 | 401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
760 | 3 | 402 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
760 | 3 | 403 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
760 | 3 | 408 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
760 | 3 | 416 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
760 | 3 | 505 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
760 | 3 | 605 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
760 | 3 | 808 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
760 | 3 | 813.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
760 | 3 | 813.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
760 | 3 | 817 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
760 | 3 | 913 | Amended Code | Citation Text |