IL HB1792 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the amendatory Act may be referred to as the Illinois Partners for Nutrient Loss Reduction Act. Provides legislative findings. Amends the State Finance Act. Provides that moneys in the Partners for Conservation Fund and the Partners for Conservation Projects Fund may be used to implement the State's Nutrient Loss Reduction Strategy, including funding for specified needs. Provides that the State Comptroller shall automatically transfer moneys to the Partners for Conservation Fund through June 30, 2027 (currently, 2021). Specifies the amount of moneys transferred to the Fund from 2022 through 2027 (currently, only for 2021). Specifies amounts and uses for moneys to be used by the Fund through specified years. Provides specified amounts to be transferred from the General Revenue Fund into the Partners for Conservation Fund for each year of 2022 through 2027. Provides that, for years 2022 through 2027, funding from the Partners for Conservation Fund shall be provided to the Environmental Protection Agency, the Department of Agriculture, and the Department of Natural Resources annually in specified amounts and for specified uses. Effective immediately.
Title
FINANCE-CONSERVATION FUNDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) February 25, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2021-05-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2021-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2021-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading (Corrected) |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 6z-32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1792&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB1792.htm |