IL HB1783 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Electronic Fund Transfer Act. Requires that a person who establishes or owns specified cash-dispensing terminals must post a telephone number on the terminal for consumers to call to report problems, along with the telephone number of the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation (rather than file notices of establishment or ownership with the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation). Repeals the Check Printer and Check Number Act and makes a conforming change in the Division of Banking Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELECTRONIC TRANSFER-DEPOSITS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 88 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2017
2017-05-10SenateDo Pass Financial Institutions; 009-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Financial Institutions
2017-04-20SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Chapin Rose
2017-03-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-08SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-08SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-08SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-07HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 088-022-002
2017-02-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-22HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 004-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2017-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2032056Amended CodeCitation Text
20561630Amended CodeCitation Text
205690ActRepealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback