IL HB1773 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0232
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0232
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Condominium Property Act. Makes a technical change in a Section pertaining to the submission of property to the provisions of the Act.
Title
CIVIL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Sacia [R] | Sen. Tim Bivins [R] | Sen. Dan Duffy [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0232 |
2013-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Duffy |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2013 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2013 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 18, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2013-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2013-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-001-000 |
2013-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2013-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary; 014-000-000 |
2013-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2013-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Sacia |
2013-03-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2013-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Sacia |
2013-03-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2013-03-08 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jim Sacia |
2013-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Sacia |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 605 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |