IL HB1739 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Provides that the offense of obstructing justice also includes destroying, altering, concealing, disguising, or otherwise tampering with samples collected for DNA fingerprinting analysis. Provides that the offense is a Class 3 felony. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963 and the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that every person arrested for committing a felony or a Class A misdemeanor shall have a sample of his or her saliva or tissue taken for DNA fingerprinting analysis, at the time of booking, for the purpose of determining identity and for certain other specified purposes. Provides that subject to appropriation, the Department of State Police shall implement this provision. Provides that this provision becomes operative no later than the earlier of the following: (1) the date on which the Department of State Police informs law enforcement agencies that the Department is ready to collect samples; or (2) January 1, 2013. Provides that in the amendatory changes to the Unified Code of Corrections, intentionally using genetic marker grouping analysis information derived from a DNA sample beyond authorized uses is a Class 3 rather than a Class 4 felony. Provides that the identification, detention, arrest, or conviction of a person based upon a database match or database information is not invalidated if it is later determined that the sample should not have been obtained or placed in the database. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM PRO-DNA ANALYSIS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-04-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 006-001-000 |
2011-02-22 | House | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 31-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 107-2.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 5-4-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1739&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB1739.htm |