IL HB1724 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-15 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-15 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that the Procurement Policy Board may object to a proposed extension or renewal of a contract within 14 (currently, 30) calendar days and require a hearing before the Board prior to entering into the extension or renewal. Provides that if the Procurement Policy Board does not object within 14 (currently, 30) calendar days or take affirmative action to recommend the extension or renewal, the chief procurement officer may enter into the extension or renewal of a contract.
Title
PROCUREMENT BOARD-OBJECTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As June 15, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Reported Back To Executive; 003-000-000 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | To Executive- Procurement |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 20-60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |