IL HB1689 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-6)
Status: Passed on August 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0482
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-6)
Status: Passed on August 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0482
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Provides that financial exploitation of an elderly person or a person with a disability is a Class 1 felony if the value of the property is $50,000 (rather than $100,000) or more but less than $100,000 or if the elderly person is over 70 years of age and the value of the property is $15,000 or more but less than $50,000 or if the elderly person is 80 years of age or older and the value of the property is $5,000 or more but less than $25,000 and a Class X felony if the value of the property is $100,000 or more or if the elderly person is over 70 years of age and the value of the property is $50,000 or more or if the elderly person is 80 years of age or older and the value of the property is $25,000 or more.
Title
CRIM CD-FINAN EXPLOIT-ELDERLY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0482 |
2011-08-22 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2011-05-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 105-000-001 |
2011-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 105-000-001 |
2011-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2011-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2011-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Emily McAsey |
2011-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Emily McAsey |
2011-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2011-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Hutchinson |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 006-000-000 |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Larry K. Bomke |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. M. Maggie Crotty |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzi Schmidt |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2011 |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2011 |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 005-000-000 |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000 |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Criminal Law Subcommittee on Special Issues |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2011-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2011-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2011-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2011-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2011-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2011-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2011-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2011-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2011-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2011-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2011-03-10 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2011-03-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 |
2011-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May |
2011-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2011-02-22 | House | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 16-1.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |