IL HB1620 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Abortion Law of 1975. Provides that subsequent to the abortion, if a child is born alive, the physician required to be in attendance shall exercise the same degree of professional skill, care, and diligence to preserve the life and health of the child as would be required of a physician providing immediate medical care to a child born alive at the same gestational age (rather than in the course of a pregnancy termination which was not an abortion).
Title
ABORTION-PHYSICIAN ATTENDANCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-02-20 | House | To Informed Consent Subcommittee |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 510 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1620&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1620.htm |