IL HB1613 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that a county with a population of less than 1,000,000 may establish minimum requirements for new building design and construction to lessen the risks caused by new building design and construction to wildlife and sensitive habitats. Effective immediately.
Title
COUNTIES CD-BLDG REGULATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-02-15 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1613&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB1613.htm |