IL HB1613 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Deletes language providing that the Section concerning the traffic and pedestrian stop statistical study is repealed on July 1, 2019. Provides that the Department of Transportation shall report specified findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on March 1, 2022 (rather than March 1, 2004). Effective immediately.
Title
TRAFFIC/PEDESTRIAN STOP STUDY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 75 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 75 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0024 |
2019-06-21 | House | Effective Date June 21, 2019 |
2019-06-21 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 032-018-000 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 006-004-000 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 075-035-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-04-10 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-003-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-01 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-27 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-02-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-005-001 |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-02-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |