IL HB1602 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Increases a sentencing enhancement to 6 years imprisonment (currently, 3 years) when the controlled substance also contains any amount of fentanyl for the following violations: manufacture or delivery, or possession with intent to manufacture or deliver, a controlled substance, a counterfeit substance, or controlled substance analog; controlled substance trafficking; calculated criminal drug conspiracy; criminal drug conspiracy; streetgang criminal drug conspiracy; or delivery of a controlled, counterfeit, or look-alike substance to a person under 18 years of age. Modifies the amount of fentanyl required to trigger sentencing intervals. Effective immediately.
Title
INCREASED SENTENCING-FENTANYL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | To Sentencing, Penalities and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 570 | 401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1602&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1602.htm |