IL HB1595 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1003
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Minimum Wage Law. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the application of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EMPLOYMENT-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-21HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1003
2018-08-21HouseEffective Date August 21, 2018
2018-08-21HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 110-000-000
2018-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 019-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-05-25HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3
2018-05-25HouseArrived in House
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2018-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Haine
2018-05-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Labor
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Labor
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
2018-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Labor
2018-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
2018-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Labor; 016-000-000
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Labor
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-04-26HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 025-000-000
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-23HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
82010515Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1595&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB1595.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB1595eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB1595enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-1003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB1595ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB1595sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB1595sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB1595sam003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB1595_04272018_034000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB1595_05252018_001000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB1595sam003_05312018_020000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback