IL HB1529 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-8)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0395
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-8)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0395
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act and Illinois Vehicle Code to provide for the issuance of Retired Law Enforcement license plates to residents of Illinois who meet eligibility requirements prescribed by the Secretary of State. Creates the Illinois Sheriffs' Association Scholarship and Training Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Provides that the applicant shall pay an additional fee of $25 for original issuance of the plates, of which $10 shall be deposited into the Illinois Sheriffs' Association Scholarship and Training Fund and $15 shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Provides that an additional fee of $25 shall be charged for each renewal, of which $23 shall be deposited into the Illinois Sheriffs' Association Scholarship and Training Fund and $2 shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Provides that moneys in the Illinois Sheriffs' Association Scholarship and Training Fund shall be paid as grants to the Illinois Sheriffs' Association for specified purposes.
Title
VEH CD-RETIRED POLICE PLATES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0395 |
2013-08-16 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-003-000 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2013 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 015-000-000 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 12, 2013 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-03-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-006-000 |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Meier |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2013-03-07 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Unes |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad E. Halbrook |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2013-02-19 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rich Brauer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.826 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-699 | New Code | See Bill Text |