IL HB1525 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Endow Illinois Tax Credit Act and amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Requires the Department of Revenue to authorize an income tax credit to taxpayers who provide an endowment gift to a permanent endowment fund. Sets forth procedures and criteria for authorizing the credits. Provides that the aggregate amount of all credits that the Department may authorize may not exceed $10,000,000 in 2011, $25,000,000 in 2012, or $50,000,000 in 2013 and each calendar year thereafter. Provides conditions for eligibility. Requires the Department to make an annual report concerning the credits. Provides that the credit may be carried forward for 5 years. Exempts the credit from the Act's sunset provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
ENDOWMENT DONATION CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr. |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pam Roth |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Nybo |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Biss |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe |
2011-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2011-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2011-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2011-02-22 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1525&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB1525.htm |