IL HB1489 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that the State, including the Department of State Police, shall not establish or maintain a registry that contains information about the purchase of a firearm or the purchaser's personal identifying information. Effective immediately.
Title
FIREARM REGISTRY PROHIBITION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2019-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-02-19 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2019-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1489&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1489.htm |