IL HB1488 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
Pending: House Firearms and Firearm Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that the Department of State Police may develop a system under which the holder of a Firearm Owner's Identification Card may display an electronic version of his or her Firearm Owner's Identification Card on a mobile telephone or other portable electronic device. Provides that an electronic version of a Firearm Owner's Identification Card shall contain security features the Department determines to be necessary to ensure that the electronic version is accurate and current and shall satisfy other requirements the Department determines to be necessary regarding form and content. Provides that the display or possession of an electronic version of a valid Firearm Owner's Identification Card in accordance with the requirements of the Department satisfies all requirements for the display or possession of a valid Firearm Owner's Identification Card under the laws of the State. Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that the Department of State Police may develop a system under which the holder of a concealed carry license may display an electronic version of his or her license on a mobile telephone or other portable electronic device. Provides that an electronic version of a license shall contain security features the Department determines to be necessary to ensure that the electronic version is accurate and current and shall satisfy other requirements the Department determines to be necessary regarding form and content. Provides that the display or possession of an electronic version of a license in accordance with the requirements of the Department satisfies all requirements for the display or possession of a valid license under the laws of the State. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FIREARMS-ELECTRONIC LICENSES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
2019-03-05HouseTo Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2019-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2019-02-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy
2019-02-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2019-02-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-02-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2019-02-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2019-02-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-01HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-29HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
430652Amended CodeCitation Text
430653Amended CodeCitation Text
430656.2New CodeSee Bill Text
4306611New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback