IL HB1466 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Condominium Property Act. Provides that upon authorization by a two-thirds vote of the members of the board of managers or by the affirmative vote of not less than a majority of the unit owners at a meeting duly called for such a purpose, or upon such greater vote as may be required by the declaration or bylaws, the board of managers acting on behalf of all unit owners may allocate the percentage of ownership in the common elements as a tract for each unit for the limited purpose of calculating the assessment or levy of any such taxes, special assessments, or charges of the State of Illinois or of any political subdivision thereof. Provides that the allocation of ownership under the new provisions shall be based on the square footage of each individual unit. Provides that the allocation of ownership under the new provisions shall also be separate from, and in addition to, the allocation for purposes of association assessments for common expenses, association special assessments and charges, and voting rights.
Title
CONDO ACT-COMMON ELEMENTS-TAX
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-14 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee; |
2019-03-14 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 005-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-02-28 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 605 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |