IL HB1460 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0222
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0222
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Motor Vehicle Ancillary Products Act. Provides that each ancillary product provider intending to issue or sell ancillary product contracts in the State shall file a registration with the Director of Insurance and designate a person in the State for service of process. Provides that each ancillary product provider shall pay to the Director a fee upon initial registration and every year thereafter. Provides that other than the ancillary product provider registration requirements in the provision requiring ancillary product provider registration, ancillary product providers and related ancillary product contract sellers, administrators, and other persons marketing, selling, offering to sell, or issuing ancillary product contracts are exempt from any licensing requirements of the State to conduct ancillary product contract business. Sets forth provisions concerning ancillary product provider financial requirements; ancillary product contract receipt requirements; disclosures; ancillary protection product warranties; reimbursement insurance policies; ancillary product contract exemption from insurance laws; prohibited acts; record keeping; cancellation of reimbursement insurance policies; obligations of reimbursement insurance policy insurers; enforcement provisions; premium taxes; applicability; and severability. Amends the Illinois Insurance Code to provide that the Code shall not be construed to apply to ancillary product contracts under the Motor Vehicle Ancillary Products Act. Effective January 1, 2014.
Title
MOTOR VEHICLE ANCILLARY PROD
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Martwick [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Gregory Harris [D] | Rep. Michael McAuliffe [R] |
Sen. Michael Hastings [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0222 |
2013-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-001-000 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2013 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 009-000-000 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 16, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-003-000 |
2013-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2013-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary; 016-000-000 |
2013-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary; by Voice Vote |
2013-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2013-03-15 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert F. Martwick |
2013-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2013-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |
2013-02-19 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 2.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |