IL HB1455 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Electronic Products Recycling and Reuse Act. Provides that a manufacturer may count the total weight of a cathode ray tube device, prior to processing, towards its goal under this Section if all recyclable components are removed from the device and the cathode ray tube glass is managed in a manner that complies with all Illinois Environmental Protection Agency regulations for handling, treatment, and disposition of cathode ray tubes. Provides that, for specified categories of electronic devices, each manufacturer shall recycle or reuse at least 80% (was at least 50%) of the total weight of the electronic devices that the manufacturer sold in that category in Illinois during the calendar year 2 years before the applicable program year. Provides that a registered recycler or a refurbisher of CEDs and EEDs for a manufacturer obligated to meet goals may not charge individual consumers or units of local government acting as collectors a fee to recycle or refurbish CEDs and EEDs, unless the recycler or refurbisher provides (i) a financial incentive, such as a coupon, that is of greater or equal value to the fee being charged or (ii) premium service, such as curbside collection, home pick-up, drop-off locations, or a similar methods of collection. Provides that, in program year 2015, and each year thereafter, if the total weight of CEDs and EEDs recycled or processed for reuse by the manufacturer is less than 100% of the manufacturer's individual recycling or reuse goal set forth in a specified provision of the Act, the manufacturer shall pay a penalty equal to the product of (i) $0.70 per pound; multiplied by (ii) the difference between the manufacturer's individual recycling or reuse goal and the total weight of CEDs and EEDs recycled or processed for reuse by the manufacturer during the program year. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELECTRONIC PRODUCTS RECYCLING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-10HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0013
2015-07-10HouseEffective Date July 10, 2015
2015-07-10HouseGovernor Approved
2015-06-17HouseSent to the Governor
2015-05-19HousePassed Both Houses
2015-05-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2015-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2015-05-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2015
2015-05-14SenateSecond Reading
2015-05-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2015
2015-05-07SenateDo Pass Environment and Conservation; 012-000-000
2015-05-06SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2015-05-06SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2015-05-05SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2015-04-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2015-04-29SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2015-04-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2015-04-28SenateFirst Reading
2015-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2015-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2015-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2015-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2015-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2015-04-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2015-04-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2015-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2015-04-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2015-04-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2015-04-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2015-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Renewable Energy & Sustainability; 014-000-000
2015-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Renewable Energy & Sustainability
2015-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2015-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey
2015-04-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2015-03-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2015-03-23HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2015-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2015-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2015-03-19HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2015-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2015-03-19HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Renewable Energy & Sustainability; 017-000-000
2015-03-19HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2015-03-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Renewable Energy & Sustainability
2015-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2015-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey
2015-02-24HouseAssigned to Renewable Energy & Sustainability
2015-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2015-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon
2015-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2015-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2015-02-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2015-02-18HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch
2015-02-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch
2015-02-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch
2015-02-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2015-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2015-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2015-02-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2015-02-05HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41515015Amended CodeCitation Text
41515050Amended CodeCitation Text
41515080Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback