IL HB1449 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Zoning Division of the Counties Code. Provides that a county board may, by majority vote (rather than by ordinance) and without a further public hearing, deny, grant, or grant subject to conditions a proposed special use on receiving the report from the board of appeals (rather than the board may adopt a proposed special use on receiving the report or it may refer the proposal back to the board of appeals for further consideration). Effective immediately.
Title
COUNTIES CODE - SPECIAL USES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2019-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 To Local Government Subcommittee |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | To Local Government Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-12009.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |